EP0222274 - 2-Hydroxybenzamides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.06.1989 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.12.1989 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LI | published on 24.01.1990 [1990/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIHON TOKUSHU NOYAKU SEIZO K.K. No.4, 2-chome, Nihonbashi Honcho Chuo-ku Tokyo 103 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/21] | For all designated states NIHON TOKUSHU NOYAKU SEIZO K.K. No.4, 2-chome, Nihonbashi Honcho Chuo-ku Tokyo 103 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kurahashi, Yoshio 47-15, Oya-machi Hachioji-shi Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Shiokawa, Kozo 210-6, Shukugawara Tama-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Matsumoto, Noboru 39-15, Namiki-cho Hachioji-shi Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Moriya, Koichi 39-15, Namiki-cho Hachioji-shi Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Izumi, Tetsuji 39-15, Namiki-cho Hachioji-shi Tokyo / JP | [1987/21] | Representative(s) | Schumacher, Günter, et al Bayer AG Konzernbereich RP Patente und Lizenzen 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/21] | Schumacher, Günter, Dr., et al Bayer AG Konzernverwaltung RP Patentabteilung D-51368 Leverkusen Bayerwerk / DE | Application number, filing date | 86115112.4 | 31.10.1986 | [1987/21] | Priority number, date | JP19850252824 | 13.11.1985 Original published format: JP 25282485 | [1987/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0222274 | Date: | 20.05.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0222274 | Date: | 17.08.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C07C103/78, C07C102/00, A01N37/26 | [1987/21] | CPC: |
A01N37/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1987/21] | Title | German: | 2-Hydroxybenzamide | [1987/21] | English: | 2-Hydroxybenzamides | [1987/21] | French: | 2-Hydroxybenzamides | [1987/21] | Examination procedure | 04.11.1986 | Examination requested [1987/21] | 15.01.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.02.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.05.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/31] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 31.10.1988 | CH | 31.10.1988 | LI | 31.10.1988 | NL | 01.05.1989 | [1990/04] |
Former [1990/01] | BE | 31.10.1988 | |
NL | 01.05.1989 | ||
Former [1989/35] | BE | 31.10.1988 | Documents cited: | Search | JPS59204161 [ ] | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 102, Nr. 1, 7, Janner 1985, Columbus, Ohio, USA KUREHA CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO., LTD. "Antifungal N-(1-haloalkoxy-2,2,2-trichloroethyl)salicylamides" Seite 539, Spalte 2, Zusammenfassung-Nr. 5 960x | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 98, Nr. 19, 9. Mai 1983, Columbus, Ohio, USA NIPPON KAYAKU CO., LTD. "2-Hydroxybenzamide derivatives" Seite 488, Spalte 1, Zusammenfassung-Nr. 160 445a |