EP0222275 - Postage meter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 21.12.1992 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 08.07.2009 [2009/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FRAMA AG Postfach 3438 Lauperswil / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1987/21] | For all designated states FRAMA AG Postfach CH-3438 Lauperswil / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Haug, Werner Oberstrasse 12 CH-3550 Langnau / CH | [1987/21] | Representative(s) | Quehl, Horst Max Patentanwalt Ringstrasse 7 Postfach 223 8274 Tägerwilen / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/28] | Quehl, Horst Max Patentanwalt Ringstrasse 7 Postfach 223 8274 Tägerwillen / CH | ||
Former [1987/21] | Quehl, Horst Max, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt Postfach 104 Ringstrasse 7 CH-8274 Tägerwilen / CH | Application number, filing date | 86115113.2 | 31.10.1986 | [1987/21] | Priority number, date | CH19850004841 | 12.11.1985 Original published format: CH 484185 | [1987/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0222275 | Date: | 20.05.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0222275 | Date: | 01.06.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0222275 | Date: | 10.01.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G07B17/00, B41J7/48 | [1988/21] | CPC: |
G07B17/00508 (EP,US);
G07B2017/00548 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1987/21] | G07B17/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1987/21] | Title | German: | Frankiermaschine | [1987/21] | English: | Postage meter | [1987/21] | French: | Machine à affranchir | [1987/21] | Examination procedure | 02.11.1988 | Examination requested [1988/52] | 05.05.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.07.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 02.10.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
10.10.1990
23.04.1991
ADMISSIBLE Francotyp- Postalia GmbH Postfach 15 14 84 D-13362 Berlin / DE Opponent's representative Schaumburg und Partner Patentanwälte mbB Mauerkircherstraße 31 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.10.1990
23.04.1991
ADMISSIBLE Francotyp- Postalia GmbH Postfach 15 14 84 D-13362 Berlin / DE Opponent's representative Schaumburg, Thoenes, Thurn, Landskron, Eckert Patentanwälte Postfach 86 07 48 81634 München / DE | ||
Former [1990/49] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.10.1990
23.04.1991
ADMISSIBLE Francotyp- Postalia GmbH Postfach 15 14 84 D-13362 Berlin / DE Opponent's representative Schaumburg, Thoenes & Thurn Mauerkircherstrasse 31 D-81679 München / DE | 26.04.1991 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 28.09.1991 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 10.10.1991 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 20.12.1991 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 05.03.1992 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 20.12.1992 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1993/06] | Appeal following opposition | 06.04.1992 | Appeal received No. T0314/92 | 24.06.1992 | Statement of grounds filed | 25.11.1992 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | CH551054 [ ] (PITNEY BOWES INC); | EP0105424 [ ] (FRAMA AG [CH]) |