EP0226784 - Power-driven insertion tool for fasteners [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.12.1989 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/27] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 D-70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Buck, Manfred, Dipl.-Ing. Erlenweg 4 D-7440 Nürtingen / DE | 02 /
Wanner, Karl, Dr. Moltkestrasse 10 D-7022 Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE | 03 /
Kabatnik, Wilfried. Dipl.-Ing. Otto-Hahn-Weg 4 D-7022 Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE | 04 /
Fehrle, Siegfried Bernhäuserstrasse 55 D-7022 Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE | 05 /
Schmid, Wolfgang. Dipl.-Ing. Reutestrasse 55 D-7024 Filderstradt 4 / DE | [1987/27] | Application number, filing date | 86115500.0 | 08.11.1986 | [1987/27] | Priority number, date | DE19853543373 | 07.12.1985 Original published format: DE 3543373 | [1987/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0226784 | Date: | 01.07.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0226784 | Date: | 07.12.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B25C1/06, B25C5/15 | [1987/27] | CPC: |
B25C5/15 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, LI [1987/27] | Title | German: | Kraftbetriebenes Einschlaggerät für Heftmittel | [1987/27] | English: | Power-driven insertion tool for fasteners | [1987/27] | French: | Outil d'enfoncement à moteur pour des agrafes | [1987/27] | File destroyed: | 26.05.1995 | Examination procedure | 08.06.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/03] | 28.08.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1990/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 30.06.1989 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3341980 ; | [X]DE3337278 ; | [X]DE3232137 ; | [X]EP0065355 ; | [X]EP0119822 ; | [X]GB2117692 ; | [X]GB2158000 ; | [X]GB2024691 |