EP0224114 - Self-clamping drill chuck [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.03.1990 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Josef Albrecht Bohrfutterfabrik GmbH + Co Plochinger Strasse 15 a D-7300 Esslingen a.N. / DE | [1987/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
* * * | 02 /
* * * | [2007/32] |
Former [1987/23] | 01 /
* * * | ||
02 /
* * * | Representative(s) | Rüger, Rudolf, et al Patentanwälte Dr.-Ing. R. Rüger Dipl.-Ing. H.P. Barthelt Webergasse 3 D-73728 Esslingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/23] | Rüger, Rudolf, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dr.-Ing. R. Rüger Dipl.-Ing. H.P. Barthelt Webergasse 3 D-73728 Esslingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 86115613.1 | 11.11.1986 | [1987/23] | Priority number, date | DE19853541964 | 27.11.1985 Original published format: DE 3541964 | [1987/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0224114 | Date: | 03.06.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0224114 | Date: | 15.03.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B23B31/12 | [1987/23] | CPC: |
B23B31/123 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1987/23] | Title | German: | Selbstspannendes Bohrfutter | [1987/23] | English: | Self-clamping drill chuck | [1987/23] | French: | Mandrin de perçage autoserrant | [1987/23] | File destroyed: | 27.01.1999 | Examination procedure | 16.09.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/18] | 07.12.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1990/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 10.10.1989 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR474658 ; | [X]FR655461 ; | [A]GB1106726 ; | [A]FR2011130 |