EP0225513 - Method and device for making dental prostheses [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.05.1992 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.07.1992 [1992/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Walter, Herbert Jockelsberg 4 D-7239 Fluorn-Winzeln / DE | [1987/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Walter, Herbert Jockelsberg 4 D-7239 Fluorn-Winzeln / DE | 02 /
Körber, Erich, Prof.Dr.med.dent. Hartmeyerstrasse 64 D-7400 Tübingen / DE | 03 /
Gentischer, Josef, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Weinbergweg 31 D-7064 Remshalden / DE | [1987/25] | Representative(s) | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/25] | Dreiss, Hosenthien, Fuhlendorf & Partner Gerokstrasse 6 D-70188 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 86115979.6 | 18.11.1986 | [1987/25] | Priority number, date | DE19853544123 | 13.12.1985 Original published format: DE 3544123 | [1987/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0225513 | Date: | 16.06.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0225513 | Date: | 19.10.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0225513 | Date: | 24.07.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A61C13/00, B23H3/04, B23H1/00 | [1988/42] | CPC: |
A61C13/0015 (EP,US);
A61C13/0003 (EP,US);
B23H9/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1987/25] | A61C13/00, B23H3/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, CH, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1987/25] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von Zahnersatz | [1987/25] | English: | Method and device for making dental prostheses | [1987/25] | French: | Méthode et dispositif de fabrication de prothèses dentaires | [1987/25] | Examination procedure | 20.02.1989 | Examination requested [1989/16] | 25.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.09.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.01.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 26.04.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.04.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1988 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   24.02.1989 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2315252 (EURO CERAM LEVALLOIS PERRET); | [AD]DE3118890 (KREYLOS HANS ALBERT [DE], et al); | [AD]DE3320902 (STACHNISS VITUS PROF DR MED DE) |