EP0268691 - Device for drying construction parts furnished with a surface layer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.12.1988 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.1988 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.02.1989 [1989/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lammers, Thomas Otto-Hahn-Strasse 39 D-400 Münster-Roxel / DE | [1988/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1988/22] | Representative(s) | Habbel, Hans-Georg Postfach 34 29 48019 Münster / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/22] | Habbel, Hans-Georg, Dipl.-Ing. Postfach 34 29 D-48019 Münster / DE | Application number, filing date | 86116042.2 | 20.11.1986 | [1988/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0268691 | Date: | 01.06.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.1987 | Classification | IPC: | F26B21/00, F26B9/06 | [1988/22] | CPC: |
F26B21/003 (EP);
F26B21/004 (EP);
F26B2210/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1988/22] | Title | German: | Anlage zum Trocknen von mit einer Oberflächenbeschichtung versehenen Bauteilen | [1988/22] | English: | Device for drying construction parts furnished with a surface layer | [1988/22] | French: | Dispositif pour sécher des pièces de construction pourvues d'une couche superficielle | [1988/22] | File destroyed: | 22.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 12.01.1988 | Examination requested [1988/22] | 07.09.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.1988 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1989/05] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]DE3538122 ; | [Y]US4465238 ; | [Y]FR2029314 ; | [A]GB964765 ; | [A]DE2338871 ; | [A]DE3049162 ; | [A]US4068390 ; | [A]DE653932 |