EP0229924 - Molten metal injecting device in die casting machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.1991 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nakano, Akio 14-1, Ichikawaminami 3-Chome Ichikawa-shi Chiba-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/31] | For all designated states Nakano, Akio 14-1, Ichikawaminami 3-Chome Ichikawa-shi Chiba-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1987/31] | Representative(s) | Lauer, Joachim Hug Interlizenz AG Nordstrasse 31 8035 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1988/24] | Lauer, Joachim, Dr. Hug Interlizenz AG Nordstrasse 31 CH-8035 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [1987/31] | Fiedler, Otto Karl, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt Freistrasse 2 CH-8200 Schaffhausen / CH | Application number, filing date | 86116144.6 | 21.11.1986 | [1987/31] | Priority number, date | JP19850270483 | 30.11.1985 Original published format: JP 27048385 | JP19850270484 | 30.11.1985 Original published format: JP 27048485 | [1987/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0229924 | Date: | 29.07.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0229924 | Date: | 30.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0229924 | Date: | 21.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B22D17/30 | [1987/31] | CPC: |
B22D17/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/31] | Title | German: | Einspritzvorrichtung für geschmolzenes Metall bei einer Spritzgussmaschine | [1987/31] | English: | Molten metal injecting device in die casting machine | [1987/31] | French: | Dispositif d'injection pour métal fondu dans une machine à couler sous pression | [1987/31] | Examination procedure | 13.01.1988 | Examination requested [1988/11] | 02.12.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.09.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 02.12.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.12.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.03.1990 | BE | 21.03.1990 | GR | 21.03.1990 | IT | 21.03.1990 | NL | 21.03.1990 | SE | 21.03.1990 | ES | 02.07.1990 | LU | 30.11.1990 | [2004/03] |
Former [2000/04] | AT | 21.03.1990 | |
BE | 21.03.1990 | ||
GR | 21.03.1990 | ||
IT | 21.03.1990 | ||
NL | 21.03.1990 | ||
SE | 21.03.1990 | ||
LU | 30.11.1990 | ||
Former [1999/52] | AT | 21.03.1990 | |
BE | 21.03.1990 | ||
IT | 21.03.1990 | ||
NL | 21.03.1990 | ||
SE | 21.03.1990 | ||
LU | 30.11.1990 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 21.03.1990 | |
BE | 21.03.1990 | ||
IT | 21.03.1990 | ||
NL | 21.03.1990 | ||
SE | 21.03.1990 | ||
Former [1991/17] | AT | 21.03.1990 | |
BE | 21.03.1990 | ||
NL | 21.03.1990 | ||
SE | 21.03.1990 | ||
Former [1990/50] | NL | 21.03.1990 | |
SE | 21.03.1990 | ||
Former [1990/44] | NL | 21.03.1990 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP56050770 ; | [A]DE441283 (PAUL HAESSLER); | [A]CH445733 (BUEHLER AG GEB [CH]); | [A]DE2135471 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 5, no. 108 (M-78)[780], 14th July 1981; & JP - A - 56 050770 (AKIO NAKANO) 08-05-1981, & JP56050770 A 00000000 |