EP0268698 - Clamping device for a punch tool on a punching machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.06.1990 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.08.1990 [1990/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schön & Cie GmbH Im Gehörnerwald 2 Pirmasens / DE | [1988/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
* * * | [1988/22] | Representative(s) | Keil, Rainer A., et al KEIL & SCHAAFHAUSEN, Patentanwälte, Cronstettenstrasse 66 60322 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/22] | Keil, Rainer A., Dipl.-Phys. Dr., et al KEIL & SCHAAFHAUSEN Patentanwälte Eysseneckstrasse 31 D-60322 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 86116301.2 | 24.11.1986 | [1988/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0268698 | Date: | 01.06.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B26D7/26, B26F1/44 | [1988/22] | CPC: |
B26D7/2614 (EP);
B26F1/44 (EP);
B26F1/40 (EP);
B26F2001/4463 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1988/28] |
Former [1988/22] | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Haltevorrichtung für Stanzmesser an einer Stanzmaschine | [1988/22] | English: | Clamping device for a punch tool on a punching machine | [1988/22] | French: | Dispositif de fixation pour poinçon de perforation dans une poinçonneuse | [1988/22] | File destroyed: | 19.06.1996 | Examination procedure | 25.11.1987 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 22.02.1988 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) GR, LU | 08.03.1988 | Examination requested [1988/22] | 18.10.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.01.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/31] | 05.03.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1990/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 24.11.1987 | GR   M02   Not yet paid | 24.11.1987 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1989 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2448835 ; | [A]DE221365 ; | [A]US4476762 ; | [A]US4233873 ; | [A]US4210047 ; | [A]US3826170 ; | [A]US2912249 ; | [A]US3089376 ; | [A]US3884132 ; | [A]DE833579 ; | [A]DE1477140 |