EP0243537 - Tool magazine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.1992 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAHO Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 1280 Tiroler Strasse 85 D-87459 Pfronten / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/45] | For all designated states MAHO Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 1280 Tiroler Strasse 85 D-87459 Pfronten / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Babel, Werner Achweg 19 D-8962 Pfronten-Meilingen / DE | [1987/45] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1987/45] | Patentanwälte Beetz - Timpe - Siegfried Schmitt-Fumian - Mayr Steinsdorfstrasse 10 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86116544.7 | 28.11.1986 | [1991/29] | Priority number, date | DE19863613206 | 18.04.1986 Original published format: DE 3613206 | [1987/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0243537 | Date: | 04.11.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0243537 | Date: | 15.03.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0243537 | Date: | 17.07.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B23Q3/155 | [1987/45] | CPC: |
B23Q3/15722 (EP,US);
Y10T29/5107 (EP,US);
Y10T483/1818 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1987/45] | Title | German: | Werkzeugmagazin | [1987/45] | English: | Tool magazine | [1987/45] | French: | Magasin d'outils | [1987/45] | Examination procedure | 29.03.1989 | Examination requested [1989/22] | 10.05.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.01.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.04.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | JP56114640 [ ]; | JP53007888 [ ]; | JP60146638 [ ]; | JP56069057 [ ]; | JP55144943 [ ]; | [X]FR2531361 (WERKZEUGMASCH HECKERT VEB [DD]); | [A]DE3505138 (SZERSZAMGEPIPARI MUEVEK [HU]) | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 5, No. 193 (M-101)[865], 9. Dezember 1981; & JP-A-56 114 640 (TOYODA KOKI K.K.) 09-09-1981, & JP56114640 A 00000000 | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 2, Nr. 47 (M-14), 29. März 1978; & JP-A-53 007 888 (MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO K.K.) 24-01-1978, & JP53007888 A 00000000 | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 9, Nr. 311 (M-436)[2034], 7. Dezember 1985; & JP-A-60 146 638 (TOSHIBA KIKAI K.K.) 02-08-1985, & JP60146638 A 00000000 | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 5, Nr. 135 (M-85)[807], 27. August 1981; & JP-A-56 069 057 (TOYODA KOKI K.K.) 10-06-1981, & JP56069057 A 00000000 | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 5, Nr. 14 (M-52)[686], 28. Januar 1981; & JP-A-55 144 943 (HITACHI SEIKI K.K.) 12-11-1980, & JP55144943 A 00000000 |