EP0250644 - Switch device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.12.1990 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEKTRONIX, INC. Tektronix Industrial Park D/S Y3-121 4900 S.W. Griffith Drive P.O. Box 500 Beaverton Oregon 97077 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/01] | For all designated states TEKTRONIX, INC. Tektronix Industrial Park D/S Y3-121 4900 S.W. Griffith Drive P.O. Box 500 Beaverton Oregon 97077 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Davis, Brent M. 13520 SW Electric Apt. No. 3 Beaverton Oregon 97005 / US | 02 /
Beckett, Frederick J. 90 S.W. 104th Avenue Portland Oregon 97225 / US | 03 /
Zandonatti, Raymond A. 11680 S.W. Denfield Beaverton Oregon 97005 / US | [1988/01] | Representative(s) | Liska, Horst, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/01] | Liska, Horst, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte H. Weickmann,K. Fincke,F.A. Weickmann, B. Huber,H. Liska,J. Prechtel,B. Böhm Postfach 86 08 20 D-81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86116655.1 | 01.12.1986 | [1988/01] | Priority number, date | US19860877081 | 23.06.1986 Original published format: US 877081 | [1988/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0250644 | Date: | 07.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0250644 | Date: | 13.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H01H51/27, H01H51/22 | [1989/52] | CPC: |
H01H51/2227 (EP,US);
H01H1/403 (EP,US);
H01H1/64 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1988/01] | H01H51/27 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1988/01] | Title | German: | Schaltapparat | [1988/01] | English: | Switch device | [1988/01] | French: | Appareil de commutation | [1988/01] | File destroyed: | 01.02.1999 | Examination procedure | 14.06.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/07] | 11.09.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1991/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 11.07.1990 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2632072 (ZELLNER FLOYD L); | [AD]US4150420 (BERG WILLIAM E); | [A]EP0022953 (SAUER HANS [DE], et al) |