EP0225580 - Metal-containing lubricant compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 05.07.1995 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ETHYL CORPORATION 330 South Fourth Street Richmond Virginia 23219 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/15] | For all designated states ETHYL CORPORATION 330 South Fourth Street Richmond Virginia 23219 / US | ||
Former [1987/25] | For all designated states AMOCO CORPORATION 200 East Randolph Drive Chicago Illinois 60601 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hunt, Mack Williss 640 Wellner Road Naperville Illinois 60540 / US | 02 /
Kennedy, Steven (NMI) 941 North Webster Street Napervillle Illinois 60540 / US | [1987/25] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/45] | Türk, Gille, Hrabal, Leifert Brucknerstrasse 20 D-40593 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [1993/15] | Türk, Gille, Hrabal, Leifert Brucknerstrasse 20 D-40593 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [1987/25] | Türk, Gille, Hrabal, Leifert Brucknerstrasse 20 D-40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 86116684.1 | 01.12.1986 | [1987/25] | Priority number, date | US19850803589 | 02.12.1985 Original published format: US 803589 | US19860929628 | 10.11.1986 Original published format: US 929628 | [1987/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0225580 | Date: | 16.06.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0225580 | Date: | 07.12.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C10M167/00, C10M159/22, C10M159/24, // (C10M167/00, 129:32, 129:95, 133:52, 133:56, 135:02, 137:10, 143:00, 145:02, 149:02, 159:16, 159:22, 159:24), C10N10:00, C10N10:02, C10N30:04, C10N40:00, C10N60:00, C10N60:14 | [1987/25] | CPC: |
C10M159/24 (EP,US);
C10M129/32 (EP,US);
C10M129/95 (EP,US);
C10M133/52 (EP,US);
C10M133/56 (EP,US);
C10M135/02 (EP,US);
C10M137/10 (EP,US);
C10M143/00 (EP,US);
C10M145/02 (EP,US);
C10M149/02 (EP,US);
C10M159/16 (EP,US);
C10M159/22 (EP,US);
C10M167/00 (EP,US);
C10M2201/066 (EP,US);
C10M2205/00 (EP,US);
C10M2205/02 (EP,US);
C10M2205/10 (EP,US);
C10M2207/023 (EP,US);
C10M2207/027 (EP,US);
C10M2207/028 (EP,US);
C10M2207/121 (EP,US);
C10M2207/122 (EP,US);
C10M2207/125 (EP,US);
C10M2207/129 (EP,US);
C10M2207/144 (EP,US);
C10M2207/146 (EP,US);
C10M2207/262 (EP,US);
C10M2207/282 (EP,US);
C10M2207/287 (EP,US);
C10M2207/288 (EP,US);
C10M2207/34 (EP,US);
C10M2209/02 (EP,US);
C10M2215/04 (EP,US);
C10M2215/042 (EP,US);
C10M2215/06 (EP,US);
C10M2215/064 (EP,US);
C10M2215/065 (EP,US);
C10M2215/08 (EP,US);
C10M2215/082 (EP,US);
C10M2215/086 (EP,US);
C10M2215/22 (EP,US);
C10M2215/221 (EP,US);
C10M2215/224 (EP,US);
C10M2215/225 (EP,US);
C10M2215/226 (EP,US);
C10M2215/24 (EP,US);
C10M2215/26 (EP,US);
C10M2215/28 (EP,US);
C10M2215/30 (EP,US);
C10M2217/02 (EP,US);
C10M2217/024 (EP,US);
C10M2217/028 (EP,US);
C10M2217/042 (EP,US);
C10M2217/043 (EP,US);
C10M2217/046 (EP,US);
C10M2217/06 (EP,US);
C10M2219/02 (EP,US);
C10M2219/022 (EP,US);
C10M2219/024 (EP,US);
C10M2219/044 (EP,US);
C10M2219/046 (EP,US);
C10M2219/062 (EP,US);
C10M2219/068 (EP,US);
C10M2219/087 (EP,US);
C10M2219/088 (EP,US);
C10M2219/089 (EP,US);
C10M2223/04 (EP,US);
C10M2223/041 (EP,US);
C10M2223/042 (EP,US);
C10M2223/045 (EP,US);
C10M2223/047 (EP,US);
C10M2223/065 (EP,US);
C10N2010/02 (EP,US);
C10N2010/04 (EP,US);
C10N2010/12 (EP,US);
C10N2010/14 (EP,US);
C10N2010/16 (EP,US);
C10N2040/25 (EP,US);
C10N2040/251 (EP,US);
C10N2040/252 (EP,US);
C10N2040/253 (EP,US);
C10N2040/255 (EP,US);
C10N2040/28 (EP,US);
C10N2070/02 (EP,US);
F02B3/06 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/25] | Title | German: | Metallenthaltende Schmiermittelzusammensetzungen | [1987/25] | English: | Metal-containing lubricant compositions | [1987/25] | French: | Compositions lubrifiantes contenant du métal | [1987/25] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 31.05.1989 | Examination requested [1989/31] | 05.09.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.03.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.03.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.07.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 21.09.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1995/34] | 09.04.1995 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1995/34] | Request for further processing for: | 21.09.1993 | Request for further processing filed | 21.09.1993 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.10.1993 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0096539 (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO [US]); | [Y]FR2339666 (LUBRIZOL CORP [US]); | [Y]WO8504896 (LUBRIZOL CORP [US]); | [Y]US4443381 (BRAID MILTON [US]); | [AD]CA1170247 (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO); | [A]EP0005337 (BRAY OIL CO [US]) |