EP0237635 - Bearing for coupling winding shafts to a driving shaft [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.1990 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kunz Maschinen- und Apparatebau GmbH Im Siegmeer 7 D-7850 Lörrach-Hauingen / DE | [1987/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kunz, Wolfgang Siegmeer 7 D-7850 Lörrach 8 / DE | [1987/39] | Representative(s) | Schmitt, Hans, et al Maucher, Börjes & Kollegen Dreikönigstrasse 13 79102 Freiburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/39] | Schmitt, Hans, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. H. Schmitt Dipl.-Ing. W. Maucher Dreikönigstrasse 13 D-79102 Freiburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 86116883.9 | 04.12.1986 | [1987/39] | Priority number, date | DE19863604611 | 14.02.1986 Original published format: DE 3604611 | [1987/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0237635 | Date: | 23.09.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0237635 | Date: | 16.08.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B65H16/06, B65H18/02, B65H19/00, F16D1/04 | [1987/39] | CPC: |
F16D1/0811 (EP,US);
B65H16/06 (EP,US);
B65H18/06 (EP,US);
B65H2301/41306 (EP,US);
B65H2301/413665 (EP,US);
Y10T403/50 (EP,US);
Y10T403/66 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [1987/39] | Title | German: | Klapplager zum Kuppeln von Wickelstäben mit einer Mitnehmerwelle | [1987/39] | English: | Bearing for coupling winding shafts to a driving shaft | [1987/39] | French: | Palier pour coupler des arbres enrouleurs avec un arbre menant | [1987/39] | Examination procedure | 11.06.1987 | Examination requested [1987/39] | 21.10.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.02.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 02.03.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.05.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 16.08.1989 | ES | 27.11.1989 | [2007/52] |
Former [2004/03] | IT | 16.08.1989 | |
ES | 27.11.1989 | ||
Former [1999/42] | IT | 16.08.1989 | Documents cited: | Search | DD200911 [ ] (ENEW CHRISTO, et al); | DE2932895 [ ] |