EP0225613 - Filter for air and gases [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.04.1991 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEBRUEDER BUEHLER AG MASCHINENFABRIK Maschinenfabrik 9240 Uzwil / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1989/50] | For all designated states GEBRUEDER BUEHLER AG MASCHINENFABRIK Maschinenfabrik CH-9240 Uzwil / CH | ||
Former [1987/25] | For all designated states Gebrüder Bühler AG CH-9240 Uzwil / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bohm, Arturo Schlattrainstrasse 16 CH-9242 Oberuzwil / CH | 02 /
Greminger, Hansueli Armetsholzstrasse 17b CH-9244 Niederuzwil / CH | 03 /
Sonderegger, Fritz Felsenstrasse 67 CH-9000 St. Gallen / CH | 04 /
Zimmermann, René Hüseren CH-9523 Züberwangen / CH | [1987/25] | Representative(s) | Révy von Belvárd, Peter Im Lindengarten 18 9242 Oberuzwil / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1989/50] | Révy von Belvárd, Peter Im Lindengarten 18 CH-9242 Oberuzwil / CH | ||
Former [1989/19] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1987/25] | Bergerin, Ralf, Dipl.-Ing. c/o BÜHLER-MIAG GmbH Postfach 3369 D-3300 Braunschweig / DE | Application number, filing date | 86116897.9 | 04.12.1986 | [1987/25] | Priority number, date | CH19850005253 | 10.12.1985 Original published format: CH 525385 | [1987/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0225613 | Date: | 16.06.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0225613 | Date: | 22.06.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B01D46/04 | [1987/25] | CPC: |
B01D46/04 (EP);
B01D46/0004 (EP);
B01D46/4272 (EP);
B01D46/58 (EP);
B01D46/71 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1987/25] | Title | German: | Filter für Luft und Gase | [1987/25] | English: | Filter for air and gases | [1987/25] | French: | Filtre pour air et gaz | [1987/25] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 29.06.1988 | Examination requested [1988/35] | 12.02.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.05.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 07.12.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/24] | 16.01.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1991/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.01.1991 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4077781 (SUNDSTROM NILS GORAN); | [AD]US4033732 (AXELSSON BIRGER, et al); | [A]US3838555 (KUBIAK J); | [A]US4157899 (WHEATON BRUCE M [US]); | [A]DE2953462 (BUEHLER AG GEB [CH]) | [A] - CHEMIE INGENIEUR TECHNIK, Band 56, Nr. 2, Februar 1984, Seiten 99-103, Verlag Chemie GmbH, Weinheim, DE; W. FLATT: "Neuere apparative Entwicklungen bei Gewebe- und Faserfiltern" |