EP0233340 - Apparatus for unloading silage bales from trench silos [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.1992 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states B. Strautmann & Söhne GmbH & Co.KG Bielefelder Strasse 53 49196 Bad Laer / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/35] | For all designated states B. Strautmann & Söhne GmbH & Co. Bielefelder Strasse 53 D-49196 Bad Laer / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Strautmann, Bernhard Müschener Strasse 4 D-4518 Bad Laer / DE | 02 /
Steffens, Josef Ravensburger Weg 13 D-4834 Harsewinkel / DE | [1987/35] | Representative(s) | Loesenbeck, Karl-Otto, et al Jöllenbecker Strasse 164 33613 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/35] | Loesenbeck, Karl-Otto, Dipl.-Ing., et al Jöllenbecker Strasse 164 D-33613 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 86116940.7 | 05.12.1986 | [1987/35] | Priority number, date | DE19863605453 | 20.02.1986 Original published format: DE 3605453 | [1987/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0233340 | Date: | 26.08.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0233340 | Date: | 27.01.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0233340 | Date: | 16.10.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.1987 | Classification | IPC: | A01F25/20 | [1987/35] | CPC: |
A01F25/2036 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [1991/36] |
Former [1987/35] | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, NL, SE | Title | German: | Gerät zum Verteilen von Futterballen aus Flachsilos | [1987/35] | English: | Apparatus for unloading silage bales from trench silos | [1987/35] | French: | Appareil pour le déchargement des balles de sillage de silos tranchés | [1987/35] | Examination procedure | 19.02.1988 | Examination requested [1988/16] | 20.11.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.11.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.04.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.07.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 31.12.1991 | GB | 16.01.1992 | [1997/17] |
Former [1993/14] | BE | 31.12.1991 | |
GB | 16.01.1992 | ||
Former [1992/48] | BE | 31.12.1991 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2204832 (STRAUTMANN & SOEHNE); | [A]AT320330B (WILHELM TEEBKEN [DE]); | [AD]DE2712204 (STRAUTMANN & SOEHNE); | [A]GB2026978 (COMIA FAO SA); | [A]DE3403374 (STRAUTMANN & SOEHNE [DE]) | Examination | DE1456911 | US4370924 |