EP0227985 - Ultrasonic sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.01.1992 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.02.1992 [1992/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/28] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Granz, Bernd, Dr. Leonhardstrasse 6 D-8507 Oberasbach / DE | [1987/28] | Application number, filing date | 86117065.2 | 08.12.1986 | [1987/28] | Priority number, date | DE19853545382 | 20.12.1985 Original published format: DE 3545382 | [1987/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0227985 | Date: | 08.07.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0227985 | Date: | 21.10.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0227985 | Date: | 06.03.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H04R1/44, H04R17/00 | [1987/28] | CPC: |
B06B1/0688 (EP,US);
Y10S310/80 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1987/28] | Title | German: | Ultraschall-Sensor | [1987/28] | English: | Ultrasonic sensor | [1987/28] | French: | Sonde ultrasonique | [1987/28] | Examination procedure | 25.11.1987 | Examination requested [1988/04] | 25.01.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.04.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.07.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.12.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD] - ULTRASONICS, Mai 1980, Seiten 123-126; IPC Business Press, Guilford, (GB) K.C. SCHOTTON et al.: "A pvdf membrane hydrophone for operation in the range 0.5 MHz to 15 MHz." | [AD] - ULTRASONICS, September 1981, Seiten 213-216, IPC Business Press, Guilford; (GB) P.A. LEWIN: "Miniature piezoelectricpolymer ultrasonic hydrophone probes." | [AD] - JOURNAL OF THE ACOUSTICS SOCIETY OF AMERICA; Band 69, Nr. 3, März 1981, Seiten 853-859; New York, (US) A.S. DeREGGI et al.: "Piezoelectricpolymer probe for ultrasonic applications." |