EP0226162 - Polyethylene-2,6-naphthalate film for magnetic recording tapes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.01.1992 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.02.1992 [1992/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DIAFOIL COMPANY, LIMITED 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/26] | For all designated states DIAFOIL COMPANY, LIMITED 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Utsumi, Shigeo 3 Sakuradai Midori-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1987/26] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Strasse 4 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/26] | TER MEER - MÜLLER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER Mauerkircherstrasse 45 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86117079.3 | 08.12.1986 | [1987/26] | Priority number, date | JP19850276646 | 09.12.1985 Original published format: JP 27664685 | [1987/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0226162 | Date: | 24.06.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0226162 | Date: | 06.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G11B5/704 | [1987/26] | CPC: |
G11B5/73935 (EP,US);
C08J5/18 (KR);
B29C48/022 (KR);
B29C48/07 (KR);
B29C55/12 (KR);
C08G63/189 (KR);
C08J7/08 (KR);
C08K7/16 (KR);
G11B5/73 (KR);
G11B5/73929 (EP,US);
C08J2367/02 (KR);
Y10T428/31 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31786 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1987/26] | Title | German: | Polyäthylen-2,6-naphthalatfolie für magnetische Aufzeichnungsbänder | [1987/26] | English: | Polyethylene-2,6-naphthalate film for magnetic recording tapes | [1987/26] | French: | Film de polyéthylène 2,6-naphtalate pour bandes d'enregistrement magnétique | [1987/26] | Examination procedure | 17.12.1987 | Examination requested [1988/07] | 22.02.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.07.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.10.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.06.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.09.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 10.09.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.12.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2424466 (TEIJIN LTD); | [A]FR2046754 (TEIJIN LTD); | [A]EP0124291 (TEIJIN LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0008679 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]) | Examination | JPS59127730 | US3501344 |