EP0225645 - Polyesterether elastomer compositions having improved flame retardant properties [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.04.1990 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION P.O. Box 189 Niagara Falls New York 14302 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/25] | For all designated states OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION P.O. Box 189 Niagara Falls New York 14302 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Markezich, Ronald L. 96 Old Orchard Williamsville New York 14221 / US | [1987/25] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/25] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86117215.3 | 10.12.1986 | [1987/25] | Priority number, date | US19850807892 | 11.12.1985 Original published format: US 807892 | US19860893121 | 04.08.1986 Original published format: US 893121 | [1987/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0225645 | Date: | 16.06.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0225645 | Date: | 12.04.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C08K13/02, C08L67/02, // (C08K13/02, 3:22, 5:34),(C08L67/02, 27:18) | [1987/25] | CPC: |
C08K3/2279 (EP);
C08K5/3417 (EP);
C08L67/025 (EP);
C08L27/18 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08K3/2279, C08L67/02 (EP);
C08K5/3417, C08L67/02 (EP);
C08L67/025, C08L2666/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1987/25] | Title | German: | Polyesteretherelastomerzusammensetzungen mit flammhemmenden Eigenschaften | [1987/25] | English: | Polyesterether elastomer compositions having improved flame retardant properties | [1987/25] | French: | Compositions à base d'élastmères de polyesteréther ayant des qualités de retardateur de flamme | [1987/25] | File destroyed: | 27.01.1999 | Examination procedure | 13.10.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/23] | 11.01.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1990/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 10.11.1989 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AP]EP0169445 ; | [A]US4521557 ; | [AD]US4374220 |