blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0226973

EP0226973 - 4-Bis(2'-hydroxyethyl)amino-1-(3'-hydroxypropyl)amino-2-nitro-benzene, process for its preparation and means for dyeing hair [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.01.1992
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip09.01.1992No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 26.02.1992 [1992/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Wella Aktiengesellschaft
Berliner Allee 65
64295 Darmstadt / DE
[N/P]
Former [1987/27]For all designated states
Wella Aktiengesellschaft
Berliner Allee 65
D-64295 Darmstadt / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Braun, Hans-Jürgen, Dr.
Im Dorf 32
CH-3183 Albligen / CH
02 / Konrad, Eugen
Mecklenburger Strasse 101
D-6100 Darmstadt / DE
03 / Mager, Herbert, Dr.
Beaumont 5
CH-1700 Fribourg / CH
[1987/27]
Application number, filing date86117311.012.12.1986
[1987/27]
Priority number, dateDE1985354599423.12.1985         Original published format: DE 3545994
[1987/27]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0226973
Date:01.07.1987
Language:DE
[1987/27]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0226973
Date:28.12.1988
Language:DE
[1988/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0226973
Date:06.03.1991
Language:DE
[1991/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.11.1988
ClassificationIPC:C07C215/08, A61K7/13
[1991/10]
CPC:
A61K8/418 (EP); A61Q5/065 (EP)
Former IPC [1987/27]C07C91/06, A61K7/13
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   ES,   GR,   IT,   LI,   SE [1987/27]
TitleGerman:4-Bis(2'-hydroxyethyl)amino-1-(3'-hydroxypropyl)amino-2-nitro-benzol, Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung sowie Mittel zum Färben von Haaren[1987/27]
English:4-Bis(2'-hydroxyethyl)amino-1-(3'-hydroxypropyl)amino-2-nitro-benzene, process for its preparation and means for dyeing hair[1987/27]
French:4-Bis(2'-hydroxyéthyl)amino-1-(3'-hydroxypropyl)amino-2-nitro-benzène, son procédé de préparation et moyen pour la teinture de cheveux[1987/27]
Examination procedure28.04.1989Examination requested  [1989/27]
02.08.1990Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
22.08.1990Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.10.1990Fee for grant paid
18.10.1990Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.12.1991No opposition filed within time limit [1992/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.11.1988Renewal fee patent year 03
02.11.1989Renewal fee patent year 04
25.10.1990Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]FR1581135  ;
 [Y]GB2112818  (OREAL);
 [XP]GB2164656  (OREAL);
 [XP]GB2164959  (OREAL)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.