EP0229986 - Cursor circuit for a dual port memory [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.01.1995 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/31] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Muhich, John Stephen 8606 Alverstone Austin Texas / US | 02 /
Thornley, Joseph Stoddard 2601 Spanish Oak trail Round Rock Texas 78681 / US | [1987/31] | Representative(s) | Burt, Roger James IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/09] | Burt, Roger James, Dr. IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | ||
Former [1991/46] | Killgren, Neil Arthur IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | ||
Former [1990/09] | Johansson, Lars E. IBM Svenska AB Intellectual Property Department 4-01 S-163 92 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [1988/35] | Ahlman, Bertel IBM Svenska AB Intellectual Property Department S-163 92 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [1987/31] | Gasslander, Sten IBM Svenska AB Intellectual Property Department S-163 92 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 86117314.4 | 12.12.1986 | [1987/31] | Priority number, date | US19860820487 | 17.01.1986 Original published format: US 820487 | [1987/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0229986 | Date: | 29.07.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0229986 | Date: | 27.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0229986 | Date: | 02.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G09G1/00 | [1987/31] | CPC: |
G09G5/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1987/31] | Title | German: | Kursorschaltung für einen Speicher mit zwei Eingängen | [1987/31] | English: | Cursor circuit for a dual port memory | [1987/31] | French: | Circuit de curseur pour une mémoire à deux entrées | [1987/31] | Examination procedure | 02.12.1987 | Examination requested [1988/05] | 13.08.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.12.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 06.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 20.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 26.07.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 11.08.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 02.03.1994 | [1999/42] | Documents cited: | Search | [AP]US4566000 | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 26, no. 10B, March 1984, pages 5622-5623, New York, US; A.C. GAY: "Cursor display on raster graphic devices" | [A] - IEEE COMPCON SPRING '85 DIGEST OF PAPERS, San Francisco, California, 25th-28th February 1985, pages 276-279, IEEE, New York, US; K. GUTTAG et al.: "New silicon to solve fundamental graphics problems" |