EP0226981 - Procedure and device for checking the under-carriage of a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.12.1990 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.12.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.02.1991 [1991/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Richard Langlechner GmbH Mauerberger Strasse 15 D-8261 Unterneukirchen / DE | [1987/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Femböck, Josef Stetheimerstrasse 11 D-8265 Neuötting / DE | [1987/27] | Representative(s) | Seidel, Herta Siedlungsstrasse 3 84494 Lohkirchen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/27] | Seidel, Herta, Dipl.-Phys. Siedlungsstrasse 3 D-84494 Lohkirchen / DE | Application number, filing date | 86117356.5 | 12.12.1986 | [1987/27] | Priority number, date | DE19853545087 | 19.12.1985 Original published format: DE 3545087 | [1987/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0226981 | Date: | 01.07.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0226981 | Date: | 01.06.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0226981 | Date: | 28.02.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G01M17/04 | [1987/27] | CPC: |
G01M17/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/27] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Überprüfung des Fahrwerks eines Kraftfahrzeuges | [1987/27] | English: | Procedure and device for checking the under-carriage of a vehicle | [1987/27] | French: | Procédé et dispositif d'essai du train d'une voiture | [1987/27] | Examination procedure | 14.06.1988 | Examination requested [1988/33] | 02.02.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.08.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.09.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 22.09.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.11.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.01.1989 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   22.02.1989 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2046373 (MONROE BELGIUM NV); | [A]DE2211540 (APP TECH ET IND S A); | [A]DE2335886 (VOLKSWAGENWERK AG); | [A]DE2362661 (VOLKSWAGENWERK AG) |