EP0273989 - Floating body or board for aquatic sports [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.12.1991 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tinkler Tail Inc. 545 Ulumalu Road Haiku Maui Hawaii 96708 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/28] | For all designated states Tinkler Tail Inc. 545 Ulumalu Road Haiku Maui Hawaii 96708 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tinkler, Mike 545 Ulumalu Rd. Haiku Maui Hawaii 96708 / US | [1988/28] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1991/19] |
Former [1988/38] | Grupe, Peter, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne-Grupe-Pellmann-Grams-Struif-Winter-Roth Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1988/28] | Brose, Karl A., Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Brose & Brose, Dipl.-Ing. Karl A. Brose, Dipl.-Ing. D. Karl Brose, Postfach 1 46, Wienerstrasse 2 D-82042 Pullach / DE | Application number, filing date | 86117413.4 | 15.12.1986 | [1988/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0273989 | Date: | 13.07.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.1987 | Classification | IPC: | A63C15/05, B63B35/86, B63B39/06 | [1988/28] | CPC: |
B63B39/061 (EP,US);
B63B32/60 (EP,US);
B63B2035/009 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/28] | Title | German: | Schwimmkörper oder Rumpf für den Wassersport | [1988/28] | English: | Floating body or board for aquatic sports | [1988/28] | French: | Flotteur ou planche pour sports nautiques | [1988/28] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 22.06.1988 | New documents discovered [1988/32] | 27.12.1988 | Examination requested [1989/09] | 13.11.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.08.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.12.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/04] | 27.08.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1992/04] | Request for further processing for: | 10.08.1990 | Request for further processing filed | 10.08.1990 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.08.1990 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 04     Fee paid on   12.02.1990 | 02.01.1991 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3200782 (WALDEN SAMUEL L, et al); | [A]US3317937 (GALLAGHER JOHN P); | [A]US3456610 (BEALS EUGENE C); | [Y]US3565030 (CURTIS GERALD J); | [X]US3902207 (TINKLER ROBERT C, et al); | [X]US3988794 (TINKLER ROBERT C, et al); | [X]DE2834291 (MARKER HANNES); | [Y]DE3425912 (STEINBERG AMIRAM) |