EP0228646 - A signal processing apparatus for disc memory devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 16.03.1989 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/29] | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sasaki, Hiroshi 23-2, Higashi Oonuma-cho 2-chome Hitachi-shi Ibaraki 316 / JP | 02 /
Chiba, Tomio 2525-303, Mawatari Katsuta-shi Ibaraki 312 / JP | 03 /
Kido, Mitsuyasu 10-12, Suehiro-cho 3-chome Hitachi-shi Ibaraki 316 / JP | 04 /
Sato, Yoshio 3-15, Hanayama-cho 1-chome Hitachi-shi Ibaraki 316 / JP | 05 /
Watanabe, Atsumi 14-4, Kuji-cho 7-chome Hitachi-shi Ibaraki 319-12 / JP | [1987/29] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1987/29] | Patentanwälte Beetz - Timpe - Siegfried Schmitt-Fumian - Mayr Steinsdorfstrasse 10 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86117490.2 | 16.12.1986 | [1987/29] | Priority number, date | JP19850287269 | 20.12.1985 Original published format: JP 28726985 | JP19860011915 | 24.01.1986 Original published format: JP 1191586 | [1987/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0228646 | Date: | 15.07.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0228646 | Date: | 14.10.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G11B20/10, G11B5/012, G11B7/013, // G11B19/28 | [1987/29] | CPC: |
G11B7/24085 (EP,US);
G11B20/10 (EP,US);
G11B5/012 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [1987/29] | Title | German: | Signal-Verarbeitungsanordnung für Platten-Speichergeräte | [1987/29] | English: | A signal processing apparatus for disc memory devices | [1987/29] | French: | Appareil de traitement de signaux pour des appareils de mémoire à disques | [1987/29] | File destroyed: | 24.07.1995 | Examination procedure | 19.10.1987 | Examination requested [1987/52] | 29.01.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.07.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1989/18] | 12.02.1989 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1989/18] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.01.1989 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP57006415 ; | [A]JP58161117 ; | [A]JP60089861 ; | [A]JP57210741 ; | [A]JP60040570 ; | [A]JP58175142 ; | [Y]US2901737 (STOVALL JR JOHN REED); | [A]US3908115 (WAGGENER WILLIAM N); | [A]EP0018157 (BURROUGHS CORP [US]); | [A]US4357635 (HASEGAWA TAKASHI); | [Y]EP0075948 (HITACHI LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0158067 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 6, no. 66 (P-112)[944], 27th April 1982; & JP-A-57 006 415 (MATSUSHITA DENKI SANGYO K.K.) 13-01-1982, & JP57006415 A 00000000 | [Y] - AFIPS CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS OF THE 1982 NATIONAL COMPUTER CONFERENCE, Houston, Texas, 7th - 10th June 1982, pages 13-17, Arlington, US; The 5.25-inch fixed/removable disk drive | [Y] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, vol. ASSP-29, no. 3, part III, June 1981, pages 736-744, IEEE, New York, US; K. MARTIN et al.: "Switched-capacitor building blocks for adaptive systems" | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 286 (P-244)[1431], 21st December 1983; & JP-A-58 161 117 (MATSUSHITA DENKI SANGYO K.K.) 24-09-1983, & JP58161117 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 236 (P-390)[1959], 21st September 1985; & JP-A-60 089 861 (MITSUBISHI DENKI K.K.) 20-05-1985, & JP60089861 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 65 (E-165)[1210], 18th March 1983; & JP-A-57 210 741 (TOKYO SHIBAURA DENKI K.K.) 24-12-1982, & JP57210741 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 163 (P-371)[1886], 9th July 1985; & JP-A-60 040 570 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO K.K.) 02-03-1985, & JP60040570 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 8, no. 18 (P-250)[1455], 26th January 1984; & JP-A-58 175 142 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO K.K.) 14-10-1983, & JP58175142 A 00000000 | [A] - 76th CONVENTION OF AUDIO ENGINEERING SOCIETY PREPRINT, New York, 8th-11th October 1984, pages 1-9, AES, New York, US; G.W. McNALLY: "Variable speed replay of digital audio with constant output sampling rate", |