EP0227082 - Process for preparation of high alpha-type silicon nitride powder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.1992 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.09.1992 [1992/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOSOH CORPORATION 4560, Oaza Tonda Shinnanyo-shi Yamaguchi-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/23] | For all designated states Tosoh Corporation 4560, Oaza Tonda Shinnanyo-shi Yamaguchi-ken / JP | ||
Former [1987/27] | For all designated states TOYO SODA MANUFACTURING CO., LTD. No. 4560, Oaza-tonda Shin-nanyo-shi Yamaguchi-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arakawa, Toshihiko 4501, Totsuka-cho Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Ueda, Kuniyoshi 3049-1, Oaza, Tonda Shinnanyo-shi, Yamaguchi-ken / JP | 03 /
Sakai, Naomichi 432-18, Kozono Ayase-shi Kanagawa / JP | 04 /
Tsukidata, Takaaki 344-275 Hodokubo Hino-shi Tokyo / JP | [1987/30] |
Former [1987/27] | 01 /
Arakawa, Toshihiko 4501, Totsuka-cho Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa / JP | ||
02 /
Ueda, Kuniyoshi 4501, Totsuka-cho Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa / JP | |||
03 /
Sakai, Naomichi 432-18, Kozono Ayase-shi Kanagawa / JP | |||
04 /
Tsukidata, Takaaki 344-275 Hodokubo Hino-shi Tokyo / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/49] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1987/27] | Patentanwälte Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Partner Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86117852.3 | 22.12.1986 | [1987/27] | Priority number, date | JP19850287960 | 23.12.1985 Original published format: JP 28796085 | [1987/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0227082 | Date: | 01.07.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0227082 | Date: | 10.02.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0227082 | Date: | 11.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C01B21/068 | [1987/27] | CPC: |
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
C01B21/0687 (EP,US);
C01P2004/50 (EP,US);
C01P2004/64 (EP,US);
C01P2006/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1987/27] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Alpha-Siliziumnitridpulvers hoher Reinheit | [1987/27] | English: | Process for preparation of high alpha-type silicon nitride powder | [1987/27] | French: | Procédé de préparation de poudre de nitrure de silicium alpha de haute pureté | [1987/27] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 22.12.1986 | Examination requested [1987/27] | 06.09.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 10.04.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.03.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.06.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 05.06.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.06.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP60155509 ; | [AP]GB2172882 (TOYO SODA MFG CO LTD) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 104, no. 8, 24th February 1986, page 130, abstract no. 53013d, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-60 155 509 (AGENCY OF INDUSTRIAL SCIENCES AND TECHNOLOGY) 15-08-1985, & JP60155509 A 00000000 | Examination | JPS5855315 | JPS5855316 |