EP0229382 - Process for producing stabilized polyamides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.06.1993 [1993/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/30] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Istel, Erich, Dr. Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 3 D-4047 Dormagen 1 / DE | 02 /
Zimmermann, Franz Am Hasenberg 30 D-4040 Neuss / DE | [1987/30] | Application number, filing date | 86117967.9 | 23.12.1986 | [1987/30] | Priority number, date | DE19863600890 | 15.01.1986 Original published format: DE 3600890 | [1987/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0229382 | Date: | 22.07.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0229382 | Date: | 10.06.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C08L77/00, C08K3/16, C08K3/10 | [1987/30] | CPC: |
C08J3/226 (EP,US);
C08K3/16 (EP,US);
C08J2377/00 (EP,US);
C08J2477/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08K3/16, C08L77/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1987/30] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung stabilisierter Polyamide | [1987/30] | English: | Process for producing stabilized polyamides | [1987/30] | French: | Procédé de production de polyamides stabilisés | [1987/30] | Examination procedure | 23.12.1986 | Examination requested [1987/30] | 03.01.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.04.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.08.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.12.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | EP0063687 [ ] (ALLIED CORP [US]); | DE1170639 [ ] (ICI LTD) | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, unexamined applications, C Feld, Vol. 8, Nr. 114, 26. Mai 1984 THE PATENT OFFICE JAPANESE GOVERNMENT Seite 95 C 225 * JP - A - 59-27 949 ( DAICEL K.K. ) * | Examination | DE2605794 |