EP0237646 - High-pressure gas filling valve for use in a pressure resistant container [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.1991 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.11.1991 [1991/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tokai Corporation 2181-7, Enokiyado, Kita-hassaku-cho Midori-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/39] | For all designated states Tokai Corporation 2181-7, Enokiyado, Kita-hassaku-cho Midori-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nitta, Tomio 2181-7, Enokiyado Kita-hassaku-cho Midori-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1987/39] | Representative(s) | Wächtershäuser, Günter Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwälte Ottostrasse 4 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/39] | Wächtershäuser, Günter, Prof. Dr. Patentanwalt, Tal 29 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86117992.7 | 23.12.1986 | [1987/39] | Priority number, date | JP19860038341U | 18.03.1986 Original published format: JP 3834186 U | [1987/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0237646 | Date: | 23.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0237646 | Date: | 06.04.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0237646 | Date: | 14.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.1988 | Classification | IPC: | F16K1/30, F23Q2/52 | [1988/14] | CPC: |
F16K1/303 (EP,US);
F16K1/307 (EP,US);
F23Q2/52 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1987/39] | F16K1/30 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR [1987/39] | Title | German: | Hochdruck-Gasfüllventil für einen druckfesten Behälter | [1987/39] | English: | High-pressure gas filling valve for use in a pressure resistant container | [1987/39] | French: | Soupape de remplissage de gaz sous pression pour un récipient résistant à la pression | [1987/39] | Examination procedure | 21.09.1988 | Examination requested [1988/47] | 08.06.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.12.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.05.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.08.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO8500871 (NATIONALE SA [CH]); | [Y]DE1550422 (NATIONALE SA); | [A]DE7736096U ; | [A]DE2424847 | Examination | JPS5531411Y | JPS5411189Y | JPS5251019U |