EP0184583 - Capping machines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.03.1990 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MB GROUP PLC Caversham Bridge House Waterman Place Reading Berkshire RG1 8DN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/16] | For all designated states MB GROUP plc Caversham Bridge House Waterman Place Reading Berkshire RG1 8DN / GB | ||
Former [1986/24] | For all designated states METAL BOX p.l.c. Queens House Forbury Road Reading RG1 3JH Berkshire / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WATERS, Sidney Walter 1 Castledene Crescent Parkstone Poole Dorset / GB | 02 /
Haslam, James Keith 138 Cutlers Place Hayes Wood Wimborne Dorset / GB | [1989/18] |
Former [1986/31] | 01 /
Haslam, James Keith May Cottage Piccadilly Lane 1 Castledene Crescent Parkstone Poole Dorset / GB | ||
02 /
Haslam, James Keith 138 Cutlers Place Hayes Wood Wimborne Dorset / GB | |||
Former [1986/24] | 01 /
Waters, Sidney Walter 1 Castledene Crescent Parkstone Poole Dorset / GB | ||
02 /
Haslam, James Keith 138 Cutlers Place Hayes Wood Wimborne Dorset / GB | Representative(s) | Griffin, Kenneth David, et al Saunders & Dolleymore LLP 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford WD18 0JU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/24] | Griffin, Kenneth David, et al Saunders & Dolleymore 9, Rickmansworth Road Watford Hertfordshire WD1 7HE / GB | Application number, filing date | 86200037.9 | 04.08.1983 | [1986/24] | Priority number, date | GB19820023653 | 17.08.1982 Original published format: GB 8223653 | [1986/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0184583 | Date: | 11.06.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0184583 | Date: | 26.08.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0184583 | Date: | 03.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B67B3/20, B67B3/22 | [1987/31] | CPC: |
B67B3/2046 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1986/24] | B67B3/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/24] | Title | German: | Verschliessmaschinen | [1986/24] | English: | Capping machines | [1986/24] | French: | Machines de fermeture | [1986/24] | Examination procedure | 22.01.1986 | Examination requested [1986/24] | 02.09.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.11.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP83304502.4 / EP0103389 | Opposition(s) | 06.02.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.05.1989 | BE | 03.05.1989 | CH | 03.05.1989 | FR | 03.05.1989 | IT | 03.05.1989 | LI | 03.05.1989 | NL | 03.05.1989 | SE | 03.05.1989 | LU | 31.08.1989 | [2002/24] |
Former [1999/52] | AT | 03.05.1989 | |
BE | 03.05.1989 | ||
CH | 03.05.1989 | ||
IT | 03.05.1989 | ||
LI | 03.05.1989 | ||
NL | 03.05.1989 | ||
SE | 03.05.1989 | ||
LU | 31.08.1989 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 03.05.1989 | |
BE | 03.05.1989 | ||
CH | 03.05.1989 | ||
IT | 03.05.1989 | ||
LI | 03.05.1989 | ||
NL | 03.05.1989 | ||
SE | 03.05.1989 | ||
Former [1990/27] | AT | 03.05.1989 | |
CH | 03.05.1989 | ||
LI | 03.05.1989 | ||
NL | 03.05.1989 | ||
SE | 03.05.1989 | ||
BE | 31.08.1989 | ||
Former [1990/16] | AT | 03.05.1989 | |
CH | 03.05.1989 | ||
LI | 03.05.1989 | ||
NL | 03.05.1989 | ||
SE | 03.05.1989 | ||
Former [1990/11] | AT | 03.05.1989 | |
NL | 03.05.1989 | ||
SE | 03.05.1989 | ||
Former [1990/09] | AT | 03.05.1989 | |
SE | 03.05.1989 | ||
Former [1989/36] | SE | 03.05.1989 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2319214 (DAVIES LYNN E); | [A]US3274748 (ROBERTS CECIL P, et al); | [A]GB1071008 (SKANE EMBALLAGE AB); | [A]FR2435395 (ANCHOR HOCKING CORP [US]); | [A]EP0018461 (ITALCAPS SPA [IT]) |