EP0189956 - Improvements to mechanisms for creating irregular effects with different appearances in warp knit fabrics [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.05.1990 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Armengol Rodo, Ramon Calle del Forn, no. 42 Terrassa Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [1986/32] | For all designated states Armengol Rodo, Ramon Calle del Forn, no. 42 Terrassa Barcelona / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1986/32] | Representative(s) | Schmitz, Yvon, et al GEVERS Patents Rue de Livourne 7, B.1 B-1050 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/29] | Schmitz, Yvon, et al GEVERS Patents Rue de Livourne 7, B.1 B-1050 Bruxelles / BE | ||
Former [1986/32] | Modrie, Guy Cabinet Vigneron Avenue G. De Longueville, 22 Bte 7-14 B-1150 Bruxelles / BE | Application number, filing date | 86200071.8 | 16.01.1986 | [1986/32] | Priority number, date | ES19850539953 | 30.01.1985 Original published format: ES 539953 | [1986/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0189956 | Date: | 06.08.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0189956 | Date: | 12.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.1986 | Classification | IPC: | D04B27/12 | [1986/32] | CPC: |
D04B27/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/32] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Erzeugen von unregelmässigen Effekten mit unterschiedlichem Aussehen in Kettenstrickwaren | [1986/32] | English: | Improvements to mechanisms for creating irregular effects with different appearances in warp knit fabrics | [1986/32] | French: | Dispositif pour créer des effets irréguliers avec apparences différentes dans des étoffes tricot chaîne | [1986/32] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 28.10.1986 | Examination requested [1986/52] | 05.02.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.06.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.01.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.04.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 05.04.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.04.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.07.1989 | BE | 12.07.1989 | CH | 12.07.1989 | FR | 12.07.1989 | IT | 12.07.1989 | LI | 12.07.1989 | NL | 12.07.1989 | SE | 01.01.1990 | LU | 31.01.1990 | [2002/24] |
Former [1999/52] | AT | 12.07.1989 | |
BE | 12.07.1989 | ||
CH | 12.07.1989 | ||
IT | 12.07.1989 | ||
LI | 12.07.1989 | ||
NL | 12.07.1989 | ||
SE | 01.01.1990 | ||
LU | 31.01.1990 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 12.07.1989 | |
BE | 12.07.1989 | ||
CH | 12.07.1989 | ||
IT | 12.07.1989 | ||
LI | 12.07.1989 | ||
NL | 12.07.1989 | ||
SE | 01.01.1990 | ||
Former [1995/46] | AT | 12.07.1989 | |
BE | 12.07.1989 | ||
CH | 12.07.1989 | ||
LI | 12.07.1989 | ||
NL | 12.07.1989 | ||
SE | 01.01.1990 | ||
Former [1991/12] | AT | 12.07.1989 | |
BE | 12.07.1989 | ||
CH | 12.07.1989 | ||
LI | 12.07.1989 | ||
NL | 12.07.1989 | ||
Former [1990/19] | AT | 12.07.1989 | |
CH | 12.07.1989 | ||
LI | 12.07.1989 | ||
NL | 12.07.1989 | ||
Former [1990/17] | CH | 12.07.1989 | |
LI | 12.07.1989 | ||
NL | 12.07.1989 | ||
Former [1990/12] | NL | 12.07.1989 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3036448 (CUNDIFF JOSEPH C); | [A]FR2327344 (DU PONT [US]); | [A]DE3015003 (ARMENGOL RODO RAMON); | [A]US4382371 (DALE DAVID, et al) |