EP0209917 - Method for manufacturing a spectacle-glass for myopes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.04.1991 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.1992 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 22.07.1992 [1992/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states N.V. OPTIMED Noordkaai 9 8700 Izegem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/05] | For all designated states N.V. OPTIMED Noordkaai 9 B-8700 Izegem / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hellstrom, Lars Kvarnbygdan 10 Mölndal / SE | [1987/05] | Representative(s) | Prüfer, Lutz H. Harthauser Strasse 25d 81545 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/33] | Prüfer, Lutz H., Dipl.-Phys. Harthauser Strasse 25d D-81545 München / DE | ||
Former [1988/51] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1987/05] | Pieraerts, Jacques, et al GEVERS Patents, Brussels Airport Business Park, Holidaystraat 5 B-1831 Diegem / BE | Application number, filing date | 86200147.6 | 03.02.1986 | [1987/05] | Priority number, date | NL19850002142 | 26.07.1985 Original published format: NL 8502142 | [1987/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0209917 | Date: | 28.01.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0209917 | Date: | 06.07.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0209917 | Date: | 13.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G02C7/02, B24B13/00 | [1988/18] | CPC: |
G02C7/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1987/05] | G02C7/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, SE [1987/05] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Brillenglases für Kurzsichtige | [1987/05] | English: | Method for manufacturing a spectacle-glass for myopes | [1987/05] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un verre de lunettes pour myopes | [1987/05] | Examination procedure | 15.08.1988 | Examination requested [1988/41] | 08.02.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.04.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.11.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.03.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 28.02.1991 | [1992/30] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1563918 (PARSONS HAROLD K); | [A]US2822647 (RIPS NORMAN N, et al); | [A]US2990664 (CEPERO GILBERTO R); | [X]DE2344558 (SMITH JOSEPH H); | [A]US3897657 (SMITH JOSEPH H) | Examination | CH634928 | BE899955 |