Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE53680T | 15.06.1990 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP86200147 | 03.02.1986 | NL8502142 | 26.07.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU587840B | Global Dossier | 31.08.1989 | B2 | AU6013386 | 29.01.1987 | A | Priority number | Date | NL8502142 | 26.07.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0209917 | Global Dossier | 13.06.1990 | B1 | EP0209917 | 06.07.1988 | A3 | EP0209917 | 28.01.1987 | A2 | Priority number | Date | NL8502142 | 26.07.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1263013 | 21.11.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | NL8502142 | 26.07.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1005185B | 20.09.1989 | B | CN86104799 | 21.01.1987 | A | Priority number | Date | NL8502142 | 26.07.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3671985D1 | 19.07.1990 | D1 | Priority number | Date | NL8502142 | 26.07.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2020010 | 16.07.1991 | A6 | Priority number | Date | NL8502142 | 26.07.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS6228161 | 06.02.1987 | A | Priority number | Date | NL8502142 | 26.07.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | NL8502142 | 16.02.1987 | A | Priority number | Date | NL8502142 | 26.07.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO862984L | 27.01.1987 | L | NO862984D0 | 24.07.1986 | D0 | Priority number | Date | NL8502142 | 26.07.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PH23181 | 29.05.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | NL8502142 | 26.07.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4707949 | 24.11.1987 | A | Priority number | Date | NL8502142 | 26.07.1985 |