EP0197569 - Manpower-driven vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.02.1988 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.02.1988 | Withdrawal of application | published on 30.03.1988 [1988/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states De Weert, Paul H. Corluylei 39 B-2210 Borsbeek / BE | [1986/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1986/42] | Representative(s) | Donné, Eddy Bureau M.F.J. Bockstael nv. Arenbergstraat 13 2000 Antwerpen / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/42] | Donné, Eddy M.F.J.Bockstael Arenbergstraat 13 B-2000 Anvers / BE | Application number, filing date | 86200255.7 | 19.02.1986 | [1986/42] | Priority number, date | BE19852060634 | 01.03.1985 Original published format: BE 2060634 | [1986/42] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0197569 | Date: | 15.10.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0197569 | Date: | 27.05.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B62M1/14 | [1986/42] | CPC: |
B62M1/14 (EP);
B62M1/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/42] | Title | German: | Durch menschliche Arbeitskraft angetriebenes Fahrzeug | [1986/42] | English: | Manpower-driven vehicle | [1986/42] | French: | Véhicule mû par l'homme | [1986/42] | File destroyed: | 22.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 08.02.1988 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1988/13] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0069932 ; | [X]DE2830691 ; | [X]DE3007674 ; | [A]DE2725842 ; | [A]FR2234175 |