EP0204352 - Chlorination of alkyl side chains of nitrogen-containing heterocycles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.1991 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.04.1991 [1991/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RÜTGERSWERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Mainzer Landstrasse 217 60326 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/50] | For all designated states RÜTGERSWERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Mainzer Landstrasse 217 D-60326 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jeromin, Günter Erich, Dr. Bergstrasse 14 D-6900 Heidelberg / DE | 02 /
Orth, Winfried, Dr. Am Schachtelgraben 28 D-6733 Hassloch/Pfalz / DE | 03 /
Fickert, Werner, Dr. Stockacher Strasse 14 D-6800 Mannheim 61 / DE | [1986/50] | Application number, filing date | 86200258.1 | 20.02.1986 | [1986/50] | Priority number, date | DE19853519364 | 30.05.1985 Original published format: DE 3519364 | [1986/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0204352 | Date: | 10.12.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0204352 | Date: | 02.09.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0204352 | Date: | 18.04.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C07D213/26, C07D215/12, C07D241/42 | [1986/50] | CPC: |
C07D215/12 (EP,US);
C07D213/26 (EP,US);
C07D241/42 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1986/50] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Chlorierung von Alkylseitenketten stickstoffhaltiger Heterocyclen | [1986/50] | English: | Chlorination of alkyl side chains of nitrogen-containing heterocycles | [1986/50] | French: | Procédé de chloruration de chaînes latérales d'alcoyle d'hétérocycles contenant de l'azote | [1986/50] | Examination procedure | 06.08.1987 | Examination requested [1987/41] | 02.06.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.06.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.08.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.10.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 12.10.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.01.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - ANGEWANDTE CHEMIE, Band 75, Nr. 5, 1963, Seiten 235-240; W. MATHES et al.: "In der Seitenkette halogenierte Methylpyridine und Methylchinoline" | [AD] - THE JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, Band 35, Nr. 3, März 1970, Seiten 719-722, The American Chemical Society; E.C. JUENGE et al.: "Chlorination of aromatic systems with trichloroisocyanuric acid under polar and free-radical conditions" |