EP0196689 - Cement slurry composition for cementing wells traversing salt formations, and corresponding cementing method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.07.1989 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.08.1989 [1989/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PUMPTECH N.V. Atlantic House Noorderlaan 147 Bus 5C, 5th Floor 2030 Antwerpen / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/16] | For all designated states PUMPTECH N.V. Atlantic House Noorderlaan 147 Bus 5C, 5th Floor B-2030 Antwerpen / BE | ||
Former [1987/05] | For all designated states DOWELL SCHLUMBERGER CORP. Drury House, Russell Street London WC2B 5H / GB | ||
Former [1986/41] | For all designated states Etudes et Fabrication Dowell Schlumberger Z.I. Molina BP 90 F-42003 Saint-Etienne Cédex 01 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oberste-Padtberg, Rudiger 3, rue du Chateau F-42100 St Etienne Terrenoire / FR | 02 /
Mc Lachlan, Richard 6 Place de l'Hôtel de Ville F-42000 Saint Etienne / FR | 03 /
Defosse, Camille 12 Domaine Poyeton F-42650 Saint Jean Bonnefonds / FR | 04 /
Rae, Phil Etudes et Fabrication Dowell Schlumberger Z.I. Molina BP 90 Saint Etienne Cedex 01 / FR | [1986/41] | Representative(s) | Richebourg, Michel François Schlumberger Dowell Dowell Patent and Licensing Deptartment 26 Rue de la Cavée 92142 Clamart Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1986/41] | Richebourg, Michel François Schlumberger Dowell Dowell Patent and Licensing Dept. 26, rue de la Cavée F-92142 Clamart Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 86200287.0 | 25.02.1986 | [1986/41] | Priority number, date | FR19850004610 | 25.03.1985 Original published format: FR 8504610 | [1986/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0196689 | Date: | 08.10.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0196689 | Date: | 31.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C04B28/04, E21B33/13, // (C04B28/04, 22:00, 22:12, 24:16, 24:18, 24:22) | [1986/41] | CPC: |
C04B22/126 (EP);
C04B28/04 (EP);
C09K8/46 (EP);
C09K8/487 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C04B28/04, C04B12/04, C04B14/10, C04B14/30, C04B14/36, C04B22/124, C04B22/126, C04B24/16, C04B24/18, C04B24/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT, NL [1986/41] | Title | German: | Zementschlammzusammensetzung für die Zementierung von Bohrlöchern durch Salzformationen und das korrespondierende Zementierungsverfahren | [1986/41] | English: | Cement slurry composition for cementing wells traversing salt formations, and corresponding cementing method | [1986/41] | French: | Composition de laitier de ciment pour cimentation de puits traversant des formations salines et procédé de cimentation correspondant | [1986/41] | Examination procedure | 19.11.1986 | Examination requested [1987/03] | 18.12.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.03.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 22.04.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.06.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]FR2540098 ; | [A]US3582375 ; | [A]US2945769 ; | [A]CH427620 ; | [A]US3928052 ; | [A]US4500357 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 95, no. 20, February 1981, page 320, abstract no. 174293z, Columbus, Ohio, US; B. OSBAECK et al.: "The influence of the content and distribution of alkalies on the hydration properties of portland cement", & CEW, CHEM. ENG. WORLD 1981, 16(6), 83-9 |