EP0196701 - Machine for handling and replacing rail switches, and track sections generally [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.1990 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.1991 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 24.07.1991 [1991/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMECA S.r.l. 4, Via Giuseppe Di Vittorio I-42025 Cavriago Reggio Emilia / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1986/41] | For all designated states AMECA S.r.l. 4, Via Giuseppe Di Vittorio I-42025 Cavriago Reggio Emilia / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fornari, Ulderico 1, Via Martiri di Soweto I-42100 Reggio Emilia / IT | [1986/41] | Representative(s) | Corradini, Corrado STUDIO SECCHI & CORRADINI Via Dante Alighieri 4 42100 Reggio Emilia / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1986/41] | Corradini, Corrado STUDIO SECCHI & CORRADINI 4, Via Dante Alighieri I-42100 Reggio Emilia / IT | Application number, filing date | 86200386.0 | 11.03.1986 | [1986/41] | Priority number, date | IT19850034833U | 25.03.1985 Original published format: IT 3483385 U | [1986/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0196701 | Date: | 08.10.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0196701 | Date: | 14.06.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.1986 | Classification | IPC: | E01B29/02 | [1986/41] | CPC: |
E01B29/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/41] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Behandlung und zum Ersetzen von Eisenbahnweichen und Eisenbahnschienenabschnitten im allgemeinen | [1989/24] | English: | Machine for handling and replacing rail switches, and track sections generally | [1986/41] | French: | Machine de manutention et de remplacement d'appareils de voie ferrée et de tronçons de voie en général | [1986/41] |
Former [1986/41] | Vorrichtung zur Behandlung und zum Ersetzen von Eisenbahneinrichtungen und Eisenbahnabschnitten im allgemeinen | Examination procedure | 26.02.1987 | Examination requested [1987/20] | 29.06.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.09.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 09.12.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.03.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 14.06.1989 | NL | 14.06.1989 | GB | 11.03.1990 | [1991/30] |
Former [1991/11] | BE | 14.06.1989 | |
NL | 14.06.1989 | ||
Former [1990/12] | NL | 14.06.1989 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE563834 (OTTO TAXIS, et al); | [A]DE2309930 (FRENZEL JUERGEN); | [A]EP0084298 (TEDESCHI ANDREA); | [A]FR2546924 (MATISA MATERIEL IND SA [CH]); | [A]FR2563545 (SOTRAMEF [FR]) |