EP0236581 - Method for determining the onset of crystallization [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.01.1991 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY 2030 Dow Center Midland, Michigan 48674 / US | [1998/02] |
Former [1987/38] | For all designated states THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY 2030 Dow Center Abbott Road P.O. Box 1967 Midland Michigan 48640-1967 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chrisman, Ray W. 5501 Swede Road Midland Michigan 48640 / US | 02 /
McLachlan, Richard D. 2412 Damman Street Midland Michigan 48640 / US | [1987/38] | Representative(s) | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., et al Vereenigde Postbus 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1987/38] | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., Ir., et al Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 97 NL-2587 BN 's-Gravenhage / NL | Application number, filing date | 86200403.3 | 13.03.1986 | [1987/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0236581 | Date: | 16.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.12.1986 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/49, G01N25/02 | [1987/38] | CPC: |
G01N25/147 (EP);
G01N21/51 (EP);
G01N2021/4709 (EP);
G01N21/8507 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1987/38] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Bestimmung des Kristallisierungsanschlags | [1987/38] | English: | Method for determining the onset of crystallization | [1987/38] | French: | Méthode pour déterminer le début d'une cristallisation | [1987/38] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 15.03.1988 | Examination requested [1988/19] | 15.09.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.03.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 18.09.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/12] | 23.10.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1991/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0171300 ; | [X]GB2073882 ; | [X]US3354317 ; | [X]WO8203460 ; | [X]EP0017007 | [A] - APPLIED SPECTROSCOPY, vol. 25, no. 5, October 1971, pages 509-516; C.C. GRAVATT, Jr.: "The applications of light scattering" | [X] - JOURNAL OF ACOUSTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, vol. 59, no. 2, February 1976, pages 329-338, The Acoustical Society of America, US; E. YILMAZ et al.: "Cavitation inception thresholds in water and nuclei spectra by light-scattering technique" |