EP0199384 - Optical measuring device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.10.1991 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.10.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.12.1991 [1991/51] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH Habsburgerallee 11 52064 Aachen / DE | For:FR
GB
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1986/44] | For:DE
Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH Röntgenstrasse 24 D-22335 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:FR
GB
Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Martens, Gerhard, Dr. Hellhörn 1a D-2086 Ellerau / DE | 02 /
Helzel, Thomas Oldesloerstrasse 107 D-2000 Hamburg 61 / DE | [1986/44] | Representative(s) | Kupfermann, Fritz-Joachim, et al Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH Postfach 10 51 49 20035 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/06] | Kupfermann, Fritz-Joachim, Dipl.-Ing., et al Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH Postfach 10 51 49 D-20035 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [1986/44] | Auer, Horst, Dipl.-Ing. Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH Wendenstrasse 35 D-20097 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 86200437.1 | 19.03.1986 | [1986/44] | Priority number, date | DE19853510704 | 23.03.1985 Original published format: DE 3510704 | [1986/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0199384 | Date: | 29.10.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0199384 | Date: | 06.07.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0199384 | Date: | 27.12.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/26, G01D5/34, G01K11/00 | [1986/44] | CPC: |
G01K11/00 (EP,US);
G01D5/268 (EP,US);
G01D5/344 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1986/44] | Title | German: | Optisches Messgerät | [1986/44] | English: | Optical measuring device | [1986/44] | French: | Appareil de mesure optique | [1986/44] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 15.12.1988 | Examination requested [1989/06] | 22.12.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.05.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 24.08.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.09.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB1540907 (STANDARD TELEPHONES CABLES LTD); | [Y]EP0021199 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO [JP]); | [Y]EP0091826 (UNIV LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR [US]) |