EP0198551 - Infra-red intruder detection system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.06.1992 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.08.1992 [1992/33] | Applicant(s) | For:GB
PHILIPS ELECTRONICS UK LIMITED 420-430 London Road Croydon CR9 3QR / GB | For:CH
DE
FR
IT
LI
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1986/43] | For:GB
PHILIPS ELECTRONICS UK LIMITED 420-430 London Road Croydon CR9 3QR / GB | ||
For:CH
DE
FR
IT
LI
Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rose, Michael Andrew MULLARD SOUTHAMPTON MILLBROOK INDUSTRIAL ESTATE Southampton, Hants SO9 7BH / GB | 02 /
Kidson, Paul MULLARD SOUTHAMPTON MILLBROOK INDUSTRIAL ESTATE Southampton, Hants SO9 7BH / GB | [1986/43] | Representative(s) | Williamson, Paul Lewis, et al Philips Electronics UK Limited Patents and Trade Marks Department Cross Oak Lane Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/05] | Williamson, Paul Lewis, et al Philips Electronics UK Limited Patents and Trade Marks Department Cross Oak Lane Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | ||
Former [1988/08] | Williamson, Paul Lewis PHILIPS ELECTRONICS Patents and Trade Marks Department Centre Point New Oxford Street London WC1A 1QJ / GB | ||
Former [1986/43] | Williamson, Paul Lewis Philips Electronics UK Limited Patents and Trade Marks Department Cross Oak Lane Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 86200614.5 | 11.04.1986 | [1986/43] | Priority number, date | GB19850009627 | 15.04.1985 Original published format: GB 8509627 | [1986/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0198551 | Date: | 22.10.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0198551 | Date: | 23.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0198551 | Date: | 21.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G08B13/18 | [1986/43] | CPC: |
G08B13/191 (EP,US);
H05B47/115 (EP,US);
Y10S250/01 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1986/43] | Title | German: | Infraroteinbruchdetektoranlage | [1986/43] | English: | Infra-red intruder detection system | [1986/43] | French: | Système de détection d'intrusion à infrarouge | [1986/43] | Examination procedure | 02.09.1988 | Examination requested [1988/45] | 07.12.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 29.01.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 06.02.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 07.05.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.05.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | EP0070364 [ ] (HIRSCHMANN RADIOTECHNIK [DE]); | EP0107042 [ ] (CERBERUS AG [CH]); | GB1186792 [ ] (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]); | GB1407840 [ ] (LICENTIA GMBH); | GB1504414 [ ] (OPTICAL COATING LABORATORY INC [US]); | GB1580403 [ ] (PHILIPS ELECTRONIC ASSOCIATED); | GB2046431 [ ] (PHILIPS ELECTRONIC ASSOCIATED); | US4342987 [ ] (ROSSIN JOHN A); | US4364030 [ ] (ROSSIN JOHN A) |