EP0204367 - Proximity fuse for an artillery projectile with base bleed reducing means [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.10.1990 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.10.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.11.1990 [1990/48] | Applicant(s) | For:FR
TELECOMMUNICATIONS RADIOELECTRIQUES ET TELEPHONIQUES T.R.T. 88, rue Brillat Savarin 75013 Paris / FR | For:DE
GB
IT
SE
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1986/50] | For:FR
TELECOMMUNICATIONS RADIOELECTRIQUES ET TELEPHONIQUES T.R.T. 88, rue Brillat Savarin F-75013 Paris / FR | ||
For:DE
GB
IT
SE
Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lefranc, André Robert Jean SOCIETE CIVILE S.P.I.D. 209 rue de l'Université F-75007 Paris / FR | [1986/50] | Representative(s) | Pyronnet, Jacques Victor Joseph, et al Société Civile S.P.I.D. 156, Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1986/50] | Pyronnet, Jacques, et al Société Civile S.P.I.D. 156, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 86200912.3 | 26.05.1986 | [1986/50] | Priority number, date | FR19850008224 | 31.05.1985 Original published format: FR 8508224 | [1986/50] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0204367 | Date: | 10.12.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0204367 | Date: | 13.12.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.1986 | Classification | IPC: | F42C13/04 | [1986/50] | CPC: |
F42C13/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1986/50] | Title | German: | Annäherungszünder für ein Artilleriegeschoss mit Bodensogreduzierung | [1986/50] | English: | Proximity fuse for an artillery projectile with base bleed reducing means | [1986/50] | French: | Fusée de proximité pour projectile d'artillerie du type à réduction de la traînée aérodynamique de culot | [1986/50] | Examination procedure | 15.05.1987 | Examination requested [1987/29] | 20.01.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.07.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.06.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.09.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 14.09.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.09.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]FR2175810 (KONGSBERG VAPENFAB AS [NO]); | [YD]FR2223658 (KONGSBERG VAPENFAB AS [NO]); | [Y]FR2289875 (BOFORS AB [SE]) |