Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0206390
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
04.07.2008 |
Change - applicant |
published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] |
10.07.1993 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 01.09.1993 [1993/35] |
09.01.1993 |
Change - applicant |
published on 03.03.1993 [1993/09] |
12.10.1992 |
Change - name/address |
published on 02.12.1992 [1992/49] |
24.07.1992 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 09.09.1992 [1992/37] |
30.01.1991 |
Change - representative |
published on 20.03.1991 [1991/12] |
24.01.1990 |
First examination report |
|
11.10.1988 |
Change - representative |
published on 30.11.1988 [1988/48] |
20.09.1988 |
Publication of search report |
published on 09.11.1988 [1988/45] |
22.05.1987 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 08.07.1987 [1987/28] |
14.11.1986 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 30.12.1986 [1986/52] |