Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU575484B | Global Dossier | 28.07.1988 | B2 | AU5847886 | 18.12.1986 | A | Priority number | Date | GB8514707 | 11.06.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0206390 | Global Dossier | 09.09.1992 | B1 | EP0206390 | 09.11.1988 | A3 | EP0206390 | 30.12.1986 | A2 | Priority number | Date | GB8514707 | 11.06.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR8602690 | 03.02.1987 | A | Priority number | Date | GB8514707 | 11.06.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1264690 | 23.01.1990 | A | Priority number | Date | GB8514707 | 11.06.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3686676T | 04.03.1993 | T2 | DE3686676D1 | 15.10.1992 | D1 | Priority number | Date | GB8514707 | 11.06.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB8514707D0 | 10.07.1985 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB8514707 | 11.06.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0134559B | 19.07.1989 | B2 | JPS61285295 | 16.12.1986 | A | Priority number | Date | GB8514707 | 11.06.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR900004520B | 28.06.1990 | B1 | KR870000416 | 18.02.1987 | A | Priority number | Date | GB8514707 | 11.06.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO167156C | 09.10.1991 | C | NO167156B | 01.07.1991 | B | NO862294L | 12.12.1986 | L | NO862294D0 | 09.06.1986 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB8514707 | 11.06.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4707291 | 17.11.1987 | A | Priority number | Date | GB8514707 | 11.06.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4873016 | 10.10.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | GB8514707 | 11.06.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA864334 | 24.02.1988 | B | Priority number | Date | GB8514707 | 11.06.1985 |