Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL74769 | 30.09.1986 | A | Priority number | Date | IL6429181 | 16.11.1981 | US22541081 | 15.01.1981 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL74770 | 30.09.1986 | A | Priority number | Date | IL6429181 | 16.11.1981 | US22541081 | 15.01.1981 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL74771 | 30.09.1986 | A | Priority number | Date | IL6429181 | 16.11.1981 | US22541081 | 15.01.1981 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4564841 | 14.01.1986 | A | Priority number | Date | US71505285 | 22.03.1985 | US22541081 | 15.01.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0056517 | Global Dossier | 08.03.1989 | B1 | EP0056517 | 20.07.1983 | A3 | EP0056517 | 28.07.1982 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US22541081 | 15.01.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0213650 | Global Dossier | 05.09.1990 | B1 | EP0213650 | 20.05.1987 | A3 | EP0213650 | 11.03.1987 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US22541081 | 15.01.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1189936 | 02.07.1985 | A | Priority number | Date | US22541081 | 15.01.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3176999D1 | 13.04.1989 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US22541081 | 15.01.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3177211D1 | 11.10.1990 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US22541081 | 15.01.1981 | Type | Earlier application | EP0056517 |