EP0213650 - Method of ascertaining navigational information [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.07.1991 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.08.1991 [1991/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Neidell, Norman S. 315 Vanderpool Houston Texas 77024 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/25] | For all designated states Neidell, Norman S. 315 Vanderpool Houston Texas 77024 / US | ||
Former [1987/11] | For all designated states Neidell, Norman S. 315 Vanderpool Houston Texas 77024 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1987/11] | Representative(s) | Boon, Graham Anthony, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/11] | Boon, Graham Anthony, et al Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 86201146.7 | 11.11.1981 | [1987/11] | Priority number, date | US19810225410 | 15.01.1981 Original published format: US 225410 | [1987/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0213650 | Date: | 11.03.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0213650 | Date: | 20.05.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0213650 | Date: | 05.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G01S1/08 | [1987/11] | CPC: |
G01S1/08 (EP);
G01S1/72 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [1987/11] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Ermittlung von Navigationsdaten | [1987/11] | English: | Method of ascertaining navigational information | [1987/11] | French: | Procédé de détermination d'informations de navigation | [1987/11] | Examination procedure | 11.08.1987 | Examination requested [1987/42] | 07.03.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 10.03.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.08.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 23.02.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 05.03.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 24.04.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP81305350.1 / EP0056517 | Opposition(s) | 06.06.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 09.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 05.09.1990 | [1991/34] | Documents cited: | Search | US4114153 [ ]; | GB1554751 [ ] |