EP0210695 - Fruit juice containing diet beverage [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.1992 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.09.1992 [1992/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/06] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kupper, Philip Lloyd 1332 Cryer Cincinnati Ohio, 45208 / US | 02 /
Moore, Katherine Louise 10 avenue de Venezuela B-1050 Brussels / BE | 03 /
Swaine, Robert Leslie, Jr. 12061 Chardon Ln Springdale Ohio 45246 / US | [1987/06] | Representative(s) | Suslic, Lydia, et al Procter & Gamble European Technical Center N.V. Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/06] | Suslic, Lydia, et al Procter & Gamble European Technical Center N.V. Temselaan 100 B-1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | Application number, filing date | 86201258.0 | 18.07.1986 | [1987/06] | Priority number, date | US19850760885 | 31.07.1985 Original published format: US 760885 | [1987/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0210695 | Date: | 04.02.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0210695 | Date: | 01.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0210695 | Date: | 11.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/236, A23L1/308, A23L2/26 | [1987/06] | CPC: |
A23L2/60 (EP,US);
A23L27/30 (EP,US);
A23L33/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/06] | Title | German: | Fruchtsaft enthaltendes Diätgetränk | [1987/06] | English: | Fruit juice containing diet beverage | [1987/06] | French: | Boisson diététique contenant du jus de fruits | [1987/06] | Examination procedure | 21.11.1988 | Examination requested [1989/03] | 18.04.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.02.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 14.05.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.06.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2143642 (PETER BIAS); | [A]DE1492982 (GRINDSTEDVAERKET AS); | [A]US3518093 (ASTI ADOLPH REYNOLD); | [Y]US3853835 (MAZUR R, et al); | [A]FR2331293 (ROQUETTE FRERES [FR]); | [A]US4163807 (JACKMAN KRISTINA R [US]); | [Y]EP0044747 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]); | [A]EP0098120 (GEN FOODS CORP [US]) |