EP0210697 - Producing a digital representation of the time-integral of an electric current [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 24.09.1992 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For:GB
PHILIPS ELECTRONICS UK LIMITED 420-430 London Road Croydon CR9 3QR / GB | For:DE
FR
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1987/06] | For:GB
PHILIPS ELECTRONICS UK LIMITED 420-430 London Road Croydon CR9 3QR / GB | ||
For:DE
FR
Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Daffarn, Patrick Anthony c/o Mel Division Manor Royal Crawley West Sussex RH10 2PZ / GB | [1987/06] | Representative(s) | Boxall, Robin John, et al Philips Electronics UK Limited Patents and Trade Marks Department Cross Oak Lane Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/07] | Boxall, Robin John, et al Philips Electronics UK Limited Patents and Trade Marks Department Cross Oak Lane Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | ||
Former [1989/05] | Osborne, David Ernest PHILIPS ELECTRONICS Patents and Trade Marks Department Philips House 188 Tottenham Court Road London W1P 9LE / GB | ||
Former [1988/08] | Osborne, David Ernest PHILIPS ELECTRONICS Patents and Trade Marks Department Centre Point New Oxford Street London WC1A 1QJ / GB | ||
Former [1987/06] | Osborne, David Ernest PHILIPS ELECTRONICS Patents and Trade Marks Department Philips House 188 Tottenham Court Road London W1P 9LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 86201265.5 | 18.07.1986 | [1987/06] | Priority number, date | GB19850018963 | 26.07.1985 Original published format: GB 8518963 | [1987/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0210697 | Date: | 04.02.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0210697 | Date: | 19.04.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G06J1/00, H03M1/36 | [1989/15] | CPC: |
G06J1/00 (EP,US);
H03M1/361 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1987/06] | H03M1/36, G06J1/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1987/06] | Title | German: | Bildung einer digitalen Darstellung des Zeitintegrals eines elektrischen Stromes | [1987/06] | English: | Producing a digital representation of the time-integral of an electric current | [1987/06] | French: | Production d'une représentation numérique de l'intégrale de temps d'un courant électrique | [1987/06] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 16.10.1989 | Examination requested [1989/50] | 24.05.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 25.05.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1992/46] | 04.06.1992 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1992/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1992 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3866131 (FIGUEROA DAVID R); | [A]US3903543 (SMITH GEORGE ELWOOD); | [Y]EP0006717 (XEROX CORP [US]) |