EP0212753 - Diphenyl ether Herbicides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.1991 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1987/10] | For all designated states SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 NL-2596 HR Den Haag / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Munro, David 40 Harvesters Way Maidstone Kent / GB | 02 /
Bit, Rino Antonio 66 Northwood Drive Sittingbourne Kent / GB | [1987/10] | Representative(s) | Bennett, David Arthur Horder, et al 4, York Road London SE1 7NA / GB | [1989/44] |
Former [1987/10] | Hunter, Keith Roger Ian Shell International Petroleum Company Limited, Intellectual Property Division, P.O. Box 662 London SE1 7NE / GB | Application number, filing date | 86201411.5 | 11.08.1986 | [1987/10] | Priority number, date | GB19850020774 | 20.08.1985 Original published format: GB 8520774 | [1987/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0212753 | Date: | 04.03.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0212753 | Date: | 30.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C07C257/22, C07C251/72, C07D207/06, C07D231/18, C07D241/08, C07D249/14, C07D333/38, A01N37/52 | [1990/22] | CPC: |
C07D231/12 (EP);
C07C241/04 (KR);
A01N37/52 (EP);
A01N43/10 (EP);
A01N43/56 (EP);
A01N43/60 (EP);
A01N43/653 (EP);
A01N47/42 (EP);
A01N47/44 (EP);
C07C281/18 (EP);
C07D231/48 (EP);
C07D233/56 (EP);
|
Former IPC [1987/10] | C07C123/02, C07C109/12, C07D207/06, C07D231/18, C07D241/08, C07D249/14, C07D333/38, A01N37/52 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/10] | Title | German: | Diphenyletherherbizide | [1987/10] | English: | Diphenyl ether Herbicides | [1987/10] | French: | Herbicides à base d'éthers diphényliques | [1987/10] | Examination procedure | 08.07.1987 | Examination requested [1987/37] | 09.08.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.02.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 15.09.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 26.09.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.10.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 21.10.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.08.1990 | SE | 12.08.1990 | BE | 31.08.1990 | CH | 31.08.1990 | LI | 31.08.1990 | LU | 31.08.1990 | [1999/52] |
Former [1992/03] | AT | 11.08.1990 | |
SE | 12.08.1990 | ||
BE | 31.08.1990 | ||
CH | 31.08.1990 | ||
LI | 31.08.1990 | ||
Former [1991/45] | SE | 12.08.1990 | |
BE | 31.08.1990 | ||
CH | 31.08.1990 | ||
LI | 31.08.1990 | ||
Former [1991/43] | SE | 12.08.1990 | |
BE | 31.08.1990 | ||
CH | 31.08.1990 | ||
LI | 31.08.1990 | ||
Former [1991/38] | SE | 12.08.1990 | |
BE | 31.08.1990 | ||
Former [1991/23] | SE | 12.08.1990 | Documents cited: | Search | GB1185950 [ ] (BAYER AG [DE]); | DE2113997 [ ] (BAYER AG); | GB2049695 [ ] (PPG INDUSTRIES INC); | EP0046445 [ ] (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]); | GB2152501 [ ] (TORII & CO LTD) |