EP0228098 - A reservoir filling arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.10.1991 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.12.1991 [1991/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Smitdesign B.V. Utrechtsestraatweg 26 NL-3958 BP Amerongen / NL | [1987/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Smit, Gerard Clement Utrechtsestraatweg 26 NL-3958 BP Amerongen / NL | [1989/44] |
Former [1987/28] | 01 /
Smit, Gerard Clement Utrechtsestraatweg 26 NL-3958 EP Amerongen / NL | Representative(s) | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., et al Vereenigde Postbus 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1987/28] | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., Ir., et al Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 97 NL-2587 BN 's-Gravenhage / NL | Application number, filing date | 86201568.2 | 11.09.1986 | [1987/28] | Priority number, date | NL19850003244 | 25.11.1985 Original published format: NL 8503244 | [1987/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0228098 | Date: | 08.07.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0228098 | Date: | 12.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.1987 | Classification | IPC: | A47J31/56, H01H35/34, G01F23/18 | [1987/28] | CPC: |
G01F23/185 (EP,US);
A47J31/56 (EP,US);
H01H35/34 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, LI, NL, SE [1987/28] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Füllen eines Behälters | [1987/28] | English: | A reservoir filling arrangement | [1987/28] | French: | Dispositif de remplissage d'un réservoir | [1987/28] | Examination procedure | 29.12.1987 | Examination requested [1988/09] | 13.01.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 06.10.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.01.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.03.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 25.06.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.09.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3141077 (LYLE BEEMAN); | [A]BE642755 (ACEC [BE]); | [A]US1977228 (CARTER HASKELL C); | [A]DE2026965 (ELTROLUD E SCHMIDT & CO); | [A]US3808961 (GROSSENBACHER E); | [A]US3396694 (GRUBER GEORGE E); | [A]US2790869 (HANSEN GILBERT H) |