EP0219902 - Process for the fixing of a metal seat ring in a valve housing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.05.1988 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.06.1988 [1988/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huisman, Klaas Altenaweg 2 NL-5126 PS Gilze / NL | [1987/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1987/18] | Representative(s) | van der Beek, George F., et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS 's-Gravenhage / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1987/18] | van der Beek, George Frans, Ir., et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Scheveningseweg 82 P.O. Box 29720 NL-2502 LS 's-Gravenhage / NL | Application number, filing date | 86201719.1 | 03.10.1986 | [1987/18] | Priority number, date | NL19850002773 | 10.10.1985 Original published format: NL 8502773 | [1987/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0219902 | Date: | 29.04.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.1987 | Classification | IPC: | F16K1/226, F16K1/42, F16B3/00 | [1987/18] | CPC: |
F16B3/005 (EP);
F16K1/2263 (EP);
F16K1/42 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/18] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Fixieren eines metallischen Sitzringes in einem Ventilgehäuse | [1987/18] | English: | Process for the fixing of a metal seat ring in a valve housing | [1987/18] | French: | Procédé de fixation d'un anneau de siège métallique dans un corps de vanne | [1987/18] | File destroyed: | 22.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 30.12.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/25] | 28.01.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1988/25] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US1822754 ; | [Y]FR1411896 ; | [A]DE2004451 ; | [A]FR2446407 ; | [A]FR2329884 ; | [A]FR2072357 |