Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | |
03.03.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.04.1994 [1994/16] |
17.05.1993 | Change - representative | published on 07.07.1993 [1993/27] |
12.03.1993 | (Expected) grant | published on 28.04.1993 [1993/17] |
05.02.1990 | First examination report | |
04.08.1989 | Request for examination filed | published on 20.09.1989 [1989/38] |
23.03.1989 | Publication of search report | published on 10.05.1989 [1989/19] |
28.02.1987 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 15.04.1987 [1987/16] |