EP0218302 - Process for purifying exhaust gas containing hydrogen sulfide and sulfur dioxide [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.03.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states METALLGESELLSCHAFT AG Postfach 10 15 01 60015 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/16] | For all designated states METALLGESELLSCHAFT AG Postfach 10 15 01, Reuterweg 14 D-60015 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Storp, Klaus, Dr. Fritz-Schubert-Ring 46 D-6000 Frankfurt am Main 60 / DE | 02 /
Ruhl, Emil, Dr. Hügelstrasse 191 D-6000 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [1987/16] | Representative(s) | Rieger, Harald Reuterweg 14 60323 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/27] | Rieger, Harald, Dr. Reuterweg 14 D-60323 Frankfurt / DE | ||
Former [1987/16] | Rieger, Harald, Dr. Reuterweg 14 D-60323 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 86201723.3 | 04.10.1986 | [1987/16] | Priority number, date | DE19853535815 | 08.10.1985 Original published format: DE 3535815 | [1987/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0218302 | Date: | 15.04.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0218302 | Date: | 10.05.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0218302 | Date: | 28.04.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/36, B01J21/06, C01B17/04 | [1987/16] | CPC: |
C01B17/0456 (EP);
B01D53/8615 (EP);
B01J23/74 (EP);
C01B17/0465 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1987/16] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Reinigen von Schwefelwasserstoff und Schwefeldioxid enthaltendem Abgas | [1987/16] | English: | Process for purifying exhaust gas containing hydrogen sulfide and sulfur dioxide | [1987/16] | French: | Procédé pour la purification de gaz d'échappement contenant de l'acide sulfhydrique et de l'anhydre sulfureux | [1987/16] | Examination procedure | 26.07.1989 | Examination requested [1989/38] | 08.02.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.05.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 12.10.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.10.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.10.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 28.10.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 25.07.1991 | Appeal received No. T0738/91 | 04.09.1991 | Statement of grounds filed | 24.09.1992 | Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant | Opposition(s) | 29.01.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE1667636 ; | [A]FR2348735 ; | [A]FR2511663 |