EP0220773 - Electric lamp [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.06.1990 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.08.1990 [1990/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1987/19] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ooms, Leo Frans Maria INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
Noteleirs, Victor Rosallie INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1987/19] | Representative(s) | Rooda, Hans, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1987/19] | Rooda, Hans, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 86201833.0 | 21.10.1986 | [1987/19] | Priority number, date | NL19850002888 | 23.10.1985 Original published format: NL 8502888 | [1987/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0220773 | Date: | 06.05.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0220773 | Date: | 06.09.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H01J61/35, H01K1/32 | [1987/19] | CPC: |
H01K1/32 (EP,US);
H01J61/35 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [1987/19] | Title | German: | Elektrische Lampe | [1987/19] | English: | Electric lamp | [1987/19] | French: | Lampe électrique | [1987/19] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 03.11.1987 | Examination requested [1988/01] | 20.09.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.03.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 06.06.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.06.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3252036 (ELMER THOMAS H, et al); | [AD]GB2103830 (OPTICAL COATING LABORATORY INC [US]); | [A]GB2139341 (GEN ELECTRIC) |