EP0221614 - Photosensitive electrophoretic displays [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.09.1991 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1987/20] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
White, Roger Paul INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1987/20] | Representative(s) | Raap, Adriaan Yde, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1987/20] | Raap, Adriaan Yde, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 86201899.1 | 31.10.1986 | [1987/20] | Priority number, date | US19850795005 | 04.11.1985 Original published format: US 795005 | [1987/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0221614 | Date: | 13.05.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0221614 | Date: | 16.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/19 | [1987/20] | CPC: |
G02F1/167 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1987/20] | Title | German: | Photoempfindliche elektrophoretische Anzeigevorrichtung | [1987/20] | English: | Photosensitive electrophoretic displays | [1987/20] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage électrophorétique photosensible | [1987/20] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 07.09.1988 | Examination requested [1988/44] | 17.12.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.04.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/45] | 04.06.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1991/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3638027 (KOELMANS HEIN); | [A]EP0087844 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) | [X] - XEROX DISCLOSURE JOURNAL, vol. 5, no. 4, July/August 1980, pages 411-413, Xerox Co., Stamford, US; J.H. BECKER: "Fast laser scanned photoconductor controlled electrophoretic display" |